D'Jamoos et al v. Atlas Aircraft Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theresa D'Jamoos, Frederick L Weingeroff, Stanley J Wachtenheim, Michael A Jacober, Dawn E Weingeroff, Leland Weingeroff, Gregg C Weingeroff, Jeffrey M Jacober, Karen L Jacober and Eric B Jacober
Defendant: Atlas Aircraft Center, Inc. and Pilatus Aircraft, LTD
Case Number: 1:2008cv00108
Filed: March 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying without prejudice 98 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 115 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 116 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (vln)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ///ORDER denying 50 Pilatus's renewed motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction; denying 71 Pilatus's motion to dismiss in favor of first-filed action; denying as moot 77 plaintiffs' motion to strike; and denying as moot 82 plaintiffs' motion to file a seven page reply brief. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lag)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying without prejudice 32 motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lag) Modified on 2/5/2009 to removed /// (vln).
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 37 plaintiffs' motion for discovery. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lag) Modified on 1/5/2009 to remove /// (vln).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Jamoos et al v. Atlas Aircraft Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa D'Jamoos
Represented By: Thomas R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick L Weingeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley J Wachtenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Jacober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn E Weingeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Weingeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg C Weingeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M Jacober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L Jacober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric B Jacober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Aircraft Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilatus Aircraft, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?