108 Degrees. LLC v. Merrimack Golf Club, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: 108 Degrees. LLC
Defendant: Merrimack Golf Club, Inc., Kevin Kattar, Genesis Management Group, LLC and Mark Buckley
Case Number: 1:2009cv00298
Filed: September 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
County: Rockingham
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re Bench Trial: Notice of Compliance Deadline for Joint filings as outlined set for 6/21/2011, 3 PM. Exhibit, Witness List and Proposed findings of fact and rulings of law due by 6/24/2011, 3 PM. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ///ORDER denying 34 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Rule 12(b)(6); denying 39 Motion to Dismiss motion to join co'def's motion to dismiss. Pursuant to this court's previous order dated January 22, 2010, defendant Mark Buckley is voluntarily DISMISSED from the case without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 34 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Rule 12(b)(6); denying 39 Motion to Dismiss motion to join co-def's motion to dismiss. Motions to dismiss denied, except as to defendant Buckley. Written order to follow. Parties are ordered to engage in mediation. Parties to notify Deputy Clerk of their choice of mediators on or before April 2, 2010. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part as outlined 36 Motion to Extend Time to February 1, 2010 to Answer Requests for Admissions. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ///ORDER approving as outlined 30 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. Plaintff's request for injunctive relief is stricken from the amended complaint. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/1/2010. (dae)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 20, 2010. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 108 Degrees. LLC v. Merrimack Golf Club, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 108 Degrees. LLC
Represented By: Paul M. DeCarolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrimack Golf Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kattar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?