Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Fadili et al

Case Number: 1:2009cv00385
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Muirhead
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is entered in favor of Deutsche Bank on Counts I and II and on all counterclaims. "Deutsche awarded $1,605,674.85 in damages on Count I. Declarato ry judgment entered on Count II as outlined." The claims that remain are Counts V, IX, and X. Deutsche Bank shall file a notice of dismissal of those claims on or before March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla) Modified on 2/23/2016 to add: "text"(dae).
May 16, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : 09cv385-LM reassigned to Judge DiClerico. Declaratory judgment action, 12cv106-JD will proceed first, followed by the quiet title action, 12cv68-JD which will be stayed until the declaratory judgment is concluded. During that time, 09cv385-JD will remain stayed. When quiet title action is resolved, Deutsche Bank to file status report in 09cv385-JD. Pretrial to be scheduled in 12cv106-JD. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
October 7, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court hereby orders that this case is stayed until Deutsche Bank has foreclosed on the vacant lot. The parties shall file a status report on or before April 9, 2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
October 4, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Fadili et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?