United States of America v. Filgate et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Suzanne M. Filgate and William L. Filgate
Case Number: 1:2010cv00137
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS: granting 21 Second Motion for Order Directing Distribution of Certain Sale Proceeds. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF SALE. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Order of Sale. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Filgate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Filgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Filgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nathan L. Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?