West v. Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kurt West
Defendant: Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc., Circor Aerospace, Inc., Coltec Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation and Rolls-Royce Corp.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00214
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER granting 532 Motion in Limine to Compel the Pre-Trial Deposition of Bruce Millar. The parties shall confer and schedule the deposition to occur no later than October 25, 2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 503 CORRECTED ORDER (opinion number only) granting 464 Motion for New Trial Renewed. The parties shall confer and jointly file a proposed pre-trial schedule on or before April 24, 2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER denying 349 Motion for New Trial, Re-file of the Motion for a New Trial filed on 10/28/2013, in accordance with this Court's order of 10/30/2013; denying 396 Motion Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ l P. 60(b)(2) and (3) for Relief from Judgment and for a New Trial, or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Evidentiary Hearing to Determine Whether Information was Improperly Withheld from Plaintiff and the Court Before and During Trial. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM ORDER re pending motions in limine, expert testimony motions, late-disclosed documents and Daubert motions. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MEMORANDUM ORDER re pending motions in limine, expert testimony motions, late-disclosed documents and Daubert motions. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PROCEDURAL ORDER denying 140 Motion to Extend Liability Discovery Deadlines to Preserve Trial Date; denying 141 Motion for Leave to Conduct Testing on Specific Capacitors and for Corresponding Modification of Pre-Tria l Deadlines (Without Change of Trial Date); denying 143 Motion for Discovery Sanctions to Preclude the Offer of Evidence; denying 137 Motion for Reconsideration re 136 Order on Motion. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 133 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re 84 Motion for Protective Order, 86 Motion for Protective Order, 91 Motion for Protective Order, 92 Supplemental Motion for Protective Order, and [#107] Motion for Leave to File to File Motion to Compel. Parties to respond as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 WRITTEN ORDER/OPINION granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel; Order denying as moot 75 Motion for Leave to File s Supplemental Affidavit. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROCEDURAL ORDER re: Discovery Dispute(setting forth Motions and brief deadlines). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER striking without prejudice 59 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Motion to Amend The Joint Discovery Plan. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ///ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Circor Aerospace, Inc. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER approving 48 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 12 - 15 days. Case Track: Complex. Affirmative defenses stricken as outlined. Defendant Goodrich Pump to amend paragraph 29 of its Answer. Court will not hold oral argument on Circor's motion to dismiss unless requested by the parties on or before 11/24/10. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/2/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 2/1/2011. Mediation Follow Up on 4/2/2012. (dae)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference set for November 16, 2010 at 2:00 pm. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circor Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coltec Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt West
Represented By: Annmarie A. Tenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?