Calef v. Citibank, N.A., Trustee, et al
Plaintiff: John M. Calef
Defendant: Chase, Chase Home Finance, LLC, Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Trustee, EMC Mortgage, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Aegis Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00526
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ///ORDER granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Counsel are reminded that pursuant to Local Rule 5.1(a), filings shall be double spaced except for quoted material. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Order dated October 25, 2012 is VACATED. Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Support of Summary Judgement in Excess of Twenty Five Pages is granted. New page limit: 30 pages. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Time to November 12, 2012 to file motion for summary judgment & November 15, 2012 to file motion to strike expert witness. Trial will be rescheduled for April 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/12/2012.(jb)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 23, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calef v. Citibank, N.A., Trustee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase
Represented By: Mary Ellen Manganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Mary Ellen Manganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Ellen Manganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., Trustee
Represented By: Mary Ellen Manganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage
Represented By: Mary Ellen Manganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Ellen Manganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Calef
Represented By: Andrew Scott Winters
Represented By: Philip A. Brouillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?