Galvin et al v. EMC Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jenny Galvin and Mark B Galvin
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Bank of New York Mellon and EMC Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00320
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ///BENCH TRIAL DECISION: FINDINGS OF FACT AND RULINGS OF LAW granting in part and denying in part 72 Emergency Motion in Limine to to exclude evidence, testimony and for sanctions, attorney's fees, costs and other relief. The court finds in favor of the defendants on all counts. Defendants entitled to costs as outlined. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 44 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 45 Motion to Strike 43 Motion for Summary Judgment, para 2 of the Affidavit of Peter G. Callagha n; denying 48 Motion to Strike 46 Objection to Motion, Aff. of Lindsay House - ECF 46-6. The Galvins' request for leave to amend the complaint is denied for the reasons outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 44 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 45 Motion to Strike 43 Motion for Summary Judgment para. 2 of the Affidavit of Peter G. Callaghan; denying 48 Motion to Strike 46 Objection to Motion, Aff. of Lindsay House - ECF 46-6. The Galvins' request for leave to amend the complaint is denied for the reasons outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting as submitted/with changes re 32 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-4 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/31/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 9/20/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 5/1/2014.(ko)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 30, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMARY ORDER denying in part and taking under advisement in part 25 Motion to Vacate 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Motion is denied insofar as it seeks reconsideration of this court's April 4, 2013 order. Plaintiffs ' request for leave to amend is taken under advisement pending defendants' anticipated objection. Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 30, 2013 is continued until further notice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss the Petitioners' Verified Ex Parte Petition for Preliminary Injunction, Declaratory Judgment, and Damages. Count 1-5 and 7-15 are DISMISSED. Count 6 may proceed against EMC Mortgage and Bank of New York Mellon. All other defendants will be terminated from the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 10 Motion to Dismiss the Petitioner's Verified Ex Parte Petition for Preliminary Injunction, Declaratory Judgment, and Damages. Parties to notify court as outlined by December 19, 2012. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvin et al v. EMC Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Galvin
Represented By: Paul J. Alfano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark B Galvin
Represented By: Paul J. Alfano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?