Palmerini v. Fidelity Investments Money Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Palmerini
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Money Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00505
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (ADA 1990)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ///ORDER granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating as moot 48 Motion to Extend Time; granting 42 Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Court Order dated may 16, 2014. Counsel for plaintiff shall pay the amount of attorneys' fees award on or before July 20, 2014. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ///ORDER granting 18 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count V. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Counsel to file supplement to discovery plan re: issues concerning electronic discovery by 6/14/13. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 6/14/2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ///ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss Count II. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmerini v. Fidelity Investments Money Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Palmerini
Represented By: Darlene M. Daniele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Money Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?