Ayer v. Heath et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ayer
Defendant: Robert Heath, Rick Morrill and NH State Prison, Warden
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2014cv00261
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Andrea K. Johnstone
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ///ORDER approving 129 Report and Recommendation; granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER approving 78 Report and Recommendation; denying 57 and 71 Motion to Amend Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief.... and add NH Dept. of Corrections as a defendant. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ///ORDER approving 55 Report and Recommendation, denying 21 , 27 , 29 , 30 , 32 , 36 , 39 , 42 . So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service as outlined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(cmp)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ///ORDER approving 15 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Further, the Motion to Addend Complaint(doc. no. 2) is GRANTED. The Clerks office is directed to docket the proposed addendum to the complaint (doc. no. 12-1) as a complaint addendum. The Motion to Appoint Counsel(doc. no. 4) is DENIED, without prejudice to refiling should circumstances arise that provide a basis for doing so. The Motion to Engage in Discovery (doc.no. 14) is motion is DENIED as premature, without prejudice as outlined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(cmp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayer v. Heath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?