Bunker v. Midstate Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Bunker
Defendant: Midstate Mutual Insurance Company and Brian Nadeau
Cross Defendant: Midstate Mutual Insurance Company
Cross Claimant: Brian Nadeau
Case Number: 1:2014cv00274
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ///ORDER denying 2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna) Modified on 8/25/2014 to add:/// (mm).
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunker v. Midstate Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Midstate Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Doreen F. Connor
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Bunker
Represented By: James E. Fiest
Represented By: Thomas E. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstate Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Doreen F. Connor
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nadeau
Represented By: Kevin G. Collimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Brian Nadeau
Represented By: Kevin G. Collimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?