McGrath v. Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden

Petitioner: Paul J. McGrath
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Respondent: Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden
Case Number: 1:2014fp00353
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Andrea K. Johnstone
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because McGrath has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, the court does not issue a certificate of appealability. 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
July 19, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Claims 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6.d are dismissed. The claims remaining in support of the § 2254 petition are Claims 6.a-c, 6.e-q, 7, and 8. The Warden shall file a motion for summary judgment on the remaining claims on or before August 19, 2016, or file an amended answer. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
February 26, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 38 Report and Recommendation dismissing claims as outlined; denying 36 Motion to Bar and Preclude respondents answer and other responsive pleading; Hold a New Trial, Vacate Sentence, etc. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGrath v. Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul J. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?