Faiella v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Faiella
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00088
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ///ORDER granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 93 Motion to Strike. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ///ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 47 Motion to Strike. All claims again Ditech in the Second Amended Complaint are struck. Parties would be well-advised to put their effort and resources into resolving this matter. Clerk shall schedule a conference with the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: denying 25 Motion to Rescind the Foreclosure sale and Foreclosure Deed; terminating as moot 23 , 24 and 28 Discovery Plans. Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint by 9/19/16. Parties to submit new joint discovery plan by 10/31/16. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ///ORDER denying 6 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faiella v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Faiella
Represented By: William C. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?