Griffin v. Manchester, NH Parole Office et al
Plaintiff: John R. Griffin, Jr.
Defendant: Lena Catovic, Mark Hastbacka, Hillsborough County Attorney's Office, Manchester, NH Parole Office, NH Parole Board, Nicole Thorspecken, Kevin Valenti and Jennifer Walters
Case Number: 1:2016fp00438
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Andrea K. Johnstone
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER approving 95 Report and Recommendation denying 45 Motion to Consider NH RSA 651-A:19 Effect of Recommittal in Respect to Parole Board's intent and actions. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ///ORDER approving 72 Report and Recommendation, granting 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and denying plaintiff's motion to strike, set forth in 42 Objection to 29 Motion to Dismiss with Motion to Strike Defendants claim of Threat. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ///ORDER approving 67 Report and Recommendation denying 28 Motion to Add Merrimack County, Its Public Defender Office, and Attorney Eleanor Spottswood as Defendants, 48 Motion for Honest Decision on Motion to Add Merrimac k County, Its Public Defender Office, and Attorney Eleanor Spottswood as defendants in this case, and 46 Motion to Charge Defendants With Violation of 18 U.S.Code § 241 Deprivation of Rights Under Color of Law. All claims against Eleanor Spottswood, the NHPD and Merrimack County are dismissed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ///ORDER approving 19 Report and Recommendation granting 6 Motion to Substitute Defendant Nicole Thorspecken, Esq. for Kent E. Smith, her Superior at Hillsborough County Attorney Office; denying 10 Motion for hearing on Constitutional Vagueness of NH Parole rule #7: "Be of good behavior" as used against me. Parties Manchester Parole Board, NH Parole Board, Hillsborough County Attorney's Office and Nicole Thorspecken terminated. Claims 2 and 3 are dismissed. Party Kent Smith substituted for Nicole Thorspecken and all claims against Thorspecken are dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Manchester, NH Parole Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lena Catovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hastbacka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester, NH Parole Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Thorspecken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Valenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?