Tompson v. Fisher

Plaintiff: Judith Tompson
Defendant: David Fisher
Case Number: 1:2017cv00069
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ///ORDER granting 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this order and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ///ORDER approving 5 Report and Recommendation dismissing plaintiff's Claims 1(D)(iii), 3, 4, 5 and 6, and denying plaintiff's request for a declaratory judgment re: 26 U.S.C. § 6334(1)(13)(B). So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw)
April 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ///ORDER approving 5 Report and Recommendation, dismissing plaintiff's Claims 1(D)(iii), 3, 4, 5 and 6, and denying plaintiff's request for a declaratory judgment re: 26 U.S.C. Section 6334(1)(13)(B). So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(ko) Modified on 4/24/2017 to add:/// (ko).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tompson v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Tompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?