Rutledge v. Elliot Health System et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Rutledge
Defendant: Elliot Health System and Elliot Hospital
Case Number: 1:2017cv00110
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ///ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granted as to Count II, wrongful termination, and is otherwise denied without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel; granting 38 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying without prejudice 22 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutledge v. Elliot Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Health System
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Hospital
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Rutledge
Represented By: David P. Slawsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?