Berry v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Plaintiff: Jason T. Berry
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation and Mark Hastbacka
Case Number: 1:2017cv00143
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ///ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ///ORDER granting without prejudice 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Granted without prejudice to file a second amended complaint by March 5, 2018. Failure to file a second amended complaint within this time frame will result in the dismissal of Berrys claims against the defendants with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER approving 12 Report and Recommendation denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason T. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hastbacka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?