D'Pergo Custom Guitars, Inc. v. Sweetwater Sound, Inc.

Plaintiff: D'Pergo Custom Guitars, Inc.
Defendant: Sweetwater Sound, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00747
Filed: December 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 83 Motion to Withdraw and Amend. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Sweetwater's motion to dismiss Counts II through V of the first amended complaint is denied. Sweetwater's motion to strike D'Pergo's reque st for attorney's fees under Count I of the first amended complaint is granted. D'Pergo's request for attorney's fees incurred in responding to the pending motion is denied. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part 27 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint; denying as moot 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 31 Motion for Judicial Notice. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Pergo Custom Guitars, Inc. v. Sweetwater Sound, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Pergo Custom Guitars, Inc.
Represented By: R James Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater Sound, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?