USA v. Salvador
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Jean Richard Salvador
Case Number: 1:2018cv00581
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Reason for Reassignment: Not all parties consent to the assignment of this case to the magistrate judge. The new case designation is: 18-cv-581-PB. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (McCormack, Michael)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jean Richard Salvador filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 9/4/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration Specifying Damages, #2 Proposed Order of Judgment by Default)(McCormack, Michael)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Entry of Default by USA.(McCormack, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 ///Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jean Richard Salvador. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Motions due by 8/20/2018. Damages Hearing set for 9/26/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) Modified on 8/16/2018 to add: "///" (kad).
July 10, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Jean Richard Salvador by USA. Served/Mailed on 7/3/2018. Answer Follow Up on 7/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCormack, Michael)
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Jean Richard Salvador. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
June 27, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
June 26, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-581-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Unlicensed Radio Operation dated July 5, 2013, #2 Exhibit Notice of Apparent Liability for Forfeiture dated March 26, 2014, #3 Exhibit Forfeiture Order dated June 24, 2014, #4 Exhibit Demand letter dated Deember 29, 2014, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Forfeiture dated June 22, 2018, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - Waiver)(McCormack, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Richard Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?