Nautilus Insurance Company v. Gwinn Design and Build, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: Richard Gwinn, Paul J. Stanton and Gwinn Design and Build, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00633
Filed: July 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion to Dismiss. Case is stayed pending the state superior court ruling on motion to set aside default judgment. If not decision is issued by 12/28/18, the stay will be lifted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 ///Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gwinn Design and Build, LLC, and Richard Gwinn. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.(ko) Modified on 9/12/2018 to add: ///(ko).
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS GWINN DESIGN AND BUILD LLC AND RICHARD GWINN filed by Nautilus Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael F. Aylward)(Aylward, Michael)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Richard Gwinn, Gwinn Design and Build, LLC. Affidavit of Service due on 9/10/2018.(ko)
August 23, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Stay Proceedings filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Follow up on Reply on 8/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Aylward, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #7 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Stay Proceedings filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Follow up on Reply on 8/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Aylward, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Richard Gwinn by Nautilus Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 7/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aylward, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Paul J. Stanton by Nautilus Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 7/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aylward, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Gwinn Design and Build, LLC by Nautilus Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 7/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aylward, Michael)
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaye Rancourt on behalf of Paul J. Stanton (Rancourt, Jaye)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Stay Proceedings filed by Paul J. Stanton. Attorney Jaye Rancourt added to party Paul J. Stanton(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 8/27/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rancourt, Jaye)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Paul J. Stanton by Nautilus Insurance Company. ( Served/Mailed on 7/26/2018., Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).), Return of Service Unexecuted by Nautilus Insurance Company as to Paul J. Stanton.(Aylward, Michael)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Gwinn Design and Build, LLC by Nautilus Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 7/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aylward, Michael)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Richard Gwinn by Nautilus Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 7/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aylward, Michael)
July 24, 2018 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENT: Nautilus Insurance Company submitted a duplicate payment in the amount of $400, receipt no. 0102-1688959, re: #1 Complaint - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper. (mc)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Richard Gwinn, Gwinn Design and Build, LLC, Paul J. Stanton. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
July 24, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 23, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-633-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Nautilus Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Aylward, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1688959 filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint in Stanton v. Gwinn, #2 Exhibit B September 13, 2017 Judgment , #3 Exhibit C Nautilus Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit D April 3, 2018 Tender Letter, #5 Exhibit E Nautilus Reservation of Rights Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - Waiver to Gwinn Design and Build, LLC, #8 Summons - Waiver to Paul Stanton, #9 Summons - Waiver to Richard Gwinn)(Aylward, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2018 to update Exhibit Descriptions (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. Gwinn Design and Build, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Stanton
Represented By: Jaye Rancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinn Design and Build, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?