Costa v. The Quikrete Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: John Costa
Defendant: The Quikrete Companies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00640
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing. The pretrial conference scheduled for 9/14/2018 is canceled. Order to issue. (vln)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan Joint filed by The Quikrete Companies, LLC. (Bouchard, Brian)
July 27, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan due by 9/7/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand and Statement of Affirmative Defenses filed by The Quikrete Companies, LLC.(Bouchard, Brian)
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-CV-00632, Rockingham County Superior Court(Bouchard, Brian)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
July 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-640-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by The Quikrete Companies, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Bouchard, Brian)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-00632 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1688006) filed by The Quikrete Companies, LLC. Answer Follow Up on 8/9/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Letter to Rockingham County Superior Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bouchard, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costa v. The Quikrete Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Quikrete Companies, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Costa
Represented By: John P. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?