Altair Instruments, Inc. v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: Altair Instruments, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Brenda Gilbert
Case Number: 1:2018cv00642
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PATENT CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The attached notice contains important information regarding special patent case related events that must be used when filing documents in a patent case. Counsel should print or otherwise save this notice and follow the instructions closely when filing documents in this case. Patent Case Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2018 03:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 10/24/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Brenda Gilbert.(Rosenblatt, Arnold)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to September 17, 2018, re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 9/17/2018. (jbw)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to September 17, 2018 filed by Brenda Gilbert. Attorney Daniel J. Bourque added to party Brenda Gilbert(pty:dft).(Bourque, Daniel)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Brenda Gilbert Declaration of Ronald P. Oines re Service of Summons and Complaint by Altair Instruments, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 7/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Oines, Ronald)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Ronald P. Oines to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert P. Oines submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/6/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(lml)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued electronically as to Brenda Gilbert. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Altair Instruments, Inc.(Lucic, Robert)
July 26, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 MOTION for Ronald P. Oines to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Altair Instruments, Inc. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-226-7326.(lml)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Ronald P. Oines to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1690325.) filed by Altair Instruments, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 8/9/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Ronald P. Oines)(Lucic, Robert)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(mc)
July 23, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 20, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-642-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 20, 2018 Filing Fee paid: $ 400 (Credit Card), receipt number 0102-1688486 by Altair Instruments, Inc. re: #1 Complaint - New Case. (mc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Altair Instruments, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lucic, Robert)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '739 patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucic, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altair Instruments, Inc. v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altair Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Represented By: Ronald P. Oines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel J. Bourque
Represented By: Arnold Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?