Carter et al v. Appledore Medical Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Carter and Lorna Carter
Defendant: Dean Carucci, Hospital Corporation of America, Nicholas Vetrano and Appledore Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00668
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Appledore Medical Group, Inc., Dean Carucci, Hospital Corporation of America, Nicholas Vetrano. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Callaghan, Peter)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appledore Medical Group, Inc., Dean Carucci, Hospital Corporation of America, Nicholas Vetrano. Surreply due by 9/24/2018. (Callaghan, Peter)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lorna Carter, Peter Carter. Follow up on Reply on 9/17/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Murphy, Kenneth)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #8 MOTION to Dismiss to 9/10/2018. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #8 MOTION to Dismiss to 9/10/2018 filed by Lorna Carter, Peter Carter.(Murphy, Kenneth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Callaghan, Peter)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2018 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan due by 9/24/2018. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appledore Medical Group, Inc., Dean Carucci, Hospital Corporation of America, Nicholas Vetrano. If no consent form has yet been filed, the plaintiff is required to file a consent on or before the date of filing an objection to this Motion. Follow up on Objection on 8/29/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Charge of Discrimination)(Callaghan, Peter)
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-CV-00665, Rockingham County Superior Court(Callaghan, Peter)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Michael G. Messerschmidt submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/13/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Michael G. Messerschmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1692829.) filed by Appledore Medical Group, Inc., Dean Carucci, Hospital Corporation of America, Nicholas Vetrano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Michael G. Messerschmidt)(Callaghan, Peter)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Michael G. Messerschmidt, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 8/30/2018. (lml)
July 31, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(lml)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(lml)
July 30, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-668-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by HCA Health Services of New Hampshire, Inc. d/b/a Portsmouth Regional Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by HCA Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Hospital Corporation of America disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Appledore Medical Group, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-00665 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1691227) filed by Dean Carucci, HCA Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Hospital Corporation of America, Appledore Medical Group, Inc., Nicholas Vetrano, HCA Health Services of New Hampshire, Inc. d/b/a Portsmouth Regional Hospital. Answer Follow Up on 8/20/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Clerk of Court, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Counsel)(Callaghan, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Appledore Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Carucci
Represented By: Michael G. Messerschmidt
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Corporation of America
Represented By: Michael G. Messerschmidt
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Vetrano
Represented By: Michael G. Messerschmidt
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appledore Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Messerschmidt
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Carter
Represented By: Kenneth D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Carter
Represented By: Kenneth D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?