Leclair v. Donovan Spring Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonya Leclair
Defendant: Donovan Spring Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00669
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Donovan Spring Co., Inc. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Iryna N. Dore on behalf of Donovan Spring Co., Inc. Notice of Attorney Appearance by Iryna N. Dore (Iacopino, Michael) Modified on 8/24/2018 to replace Michael Iacopino with Iryna Dore (ko).
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Donovan Spring Co., Inc. by Sonya Leclair. Served/Mailed on 8/8/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/10/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meyer, H.)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Donovan Spring Co., Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 1, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 30, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-669-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1691434 filed by Sonya Leclair. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Meyer, H.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: #4 Completed Notice of Lawsuit, #5 Completed Waiver of Service, #6 Completed Civil Cover Sheet) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leclair v. Donovan Spring Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Leclair
Represented By: H. Jonathan Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Spring Co., Inc.
Represented By: Iryna N. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?