Harris v. Tarkett USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nigel Harris
Defendant: Mark Zak, Ron Conrad and Tarkett USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00677
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Nigel Harris. (Varraso, Michael)
August 28, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/26/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ron Conrad, Tarkett USA Inc., Mark Zak.(Caterine, Melinda)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Answer Follow Up on 8/27/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer filed by Ron Conrad, Tarkett USA Inc., Mark Zak.(Caterine, Melinda)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Ron Conrad, Tarkett USA Inc., Mark Zak filed by Nigel Harris. Served/Mailed on 7/30/2018. Answer Follow Up on 8/20/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(Varraso, Michael)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2018-cv-00334, Merrimack County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 - State Court Docket Sheet [Case Summary], #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) 2 - Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (Affidavit) 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit (Affidavit) 4 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal and Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit (Affidavit) 5 - Clerk's Certificate re certified record)(Caterine, Melinda)
August 2, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
July 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-677-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Tarkett USA Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Caterine, Melinda)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Merrimack Superior Court, case number 217-2018-cv-00334 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1692266) filed by Mark Zak, Ron Conrad, Tarkett USA Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 8/21/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Kathryn Vanderwist, #2 Exhibit B - State Court records, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Removal [State Court], #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Adverse Party of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Letter to State Court Clerk, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caterine, Melinda) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2018: #7 PDF Text Searchable Removal) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Tarkett USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zak
Represented By: Melinda J. Caterine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Conrad
Represented By: Melinda J. Caterine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarkett USA Inc.
Represented By: Melinda J. Caterine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nigel Harris
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wyatt
Represented By: Michael Varraso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?