Loomer v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Earle R. Loomer, III
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00680
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (js)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #6 Stipulation of Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 ///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Case by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc.(Piedra, Israel) Modified on 8/7/2018 to add: ///(js).
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. re: #4 Disclosure Statement (Piedra, Israel)
August 7, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Disclosure Statement filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. No certificate of service. Filer shall file a certificate of service using the Certificate of Service event and link the filing back to originally filed document. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 8/8/2018.(js)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Piedra, Israel)
August 3, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #3 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack S. White on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. Attorney Jack S. White added to party Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(White, Jack)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 ERISA Notice sent to all parties.(mc)
August 2, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
August 1, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by August 8, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 8/8/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
August 1, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-680-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 ERISA NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court -- North, case number 457-2018-SC-00273 (Docket no. in small claims ct -- transferred to Superior Court. No docket # issued yet) (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1692577) filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 8/22/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/15/2018. ERISA Administrative Record Due 8/21/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Relevant Excerpts of ERISA Plan, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit Notice to Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Piedra, Israel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loomer v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earle R. Loomer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Israel Francisco Piedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Israel Francisco Piedra
Represented By: Jack S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?