C. et al v. Manchester School District SAU 37 et al
Plaintiff: George C. and Susan C.
Defendant: Manchester School District SAU 37 and Bolgen Vargas
Case Number: 1:2018cv00724
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Manchester School District SAU 37 by Susan C., George C.. Served/Mailed on 8/20/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/22/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Zakre, Sheila)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bolgen Vargas by Susan C., George C.. Served/Mailed on 8/20/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/22/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Zakre, Sheila)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 10/16/2018. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa A. Hewey on behalf of Manchester School District SAU 37, Bolgen Vargas Attorney Melissa A. Hewey added to party Manchester School District SAU 37(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa A. Hewey added to party Bolgen Vargas(pty:dft).(Hewey, Melissa)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Manchester School District SAU 37, Bolgen Vargas with jury demand filed by Susan C., George C..(Zakre, Sheila)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 Potential CONSOLIDATION Notice. Cases 1:18-cv-724-AJ and 1:18-cv-749-JD may be consolidated. Objections to Consolidation due 10/8/2018. (mc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Bolgen Vargas. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (mc)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #3 MOTION Seal Complaint filed 8-20-18. Text of Order: Granted. The original unredacted complaint shall be sealed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(f). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (mc)
August 22, 2018 Initial Filing Fee paid: $400 (Credit Card), receipt number 14649016799 by Susan C., George C. re: #1 Complaint - New Case. (mc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby denied. If the plaintiffs wishes to proceed with the case, the filing fee payment of $400 is due on or before September 10, 2018 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (mc)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION Seal Complaint filed 8-20-18 filed by George C., Susan C.. Follow up on Objection on 9/4/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Zakre, Sheila)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. (mc)
August 20, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-724-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by George C., Susan C.. Follow up on Objection on 9/4/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Financial affidavit)(Zakre, Sheila)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Susan C., George C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice and Request for Waiver, #3 Waiver)(Zakre, Sheila) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2018: #4 Redacted Complaint) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. et al v. Manchester School District SAU 37 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George C.
Represented By: Sheila O'Leary Zakre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan C.
Represented By: Sheila O'Leary Zakre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester School District SAU 37
Represented By: Melissa A. Hewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolgen Vargas
Represented By: Melissa A. Hewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?