BGP Properties, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Plaintiff: BGP Properties LLC and BGP Properties, LLC
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 1:2018cv00729
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 10/16/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Pretrial Statements due 9/16/2019. JERS Statement due 9/16/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 9/30/2019. (js)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving with changes #9 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 6/3/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 1/3/2019. Discovery deadline 5/1/2019. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 2/20/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 2/25/2019.(js)
September 21, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The new case designation is: 18-cv-729-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (vln)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Graceffa, John)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Graceffa, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 215-2018-CV-00113, Grafton County Superior Court(Graceffa, John)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE of State Court Record Due. LR 81.1(c): The removing party shall file with the clerk's office a certified or attested copy of the state court record within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the notice of removal. State Court Record due within 7 days of this notice. (vln)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by BGP Properties, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Cole, Carolyn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Graceffa, John)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Notice (Other) filed by BGP Properties, LLC. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used Notices / Change of Address. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-226-7733.(vln)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address of Cole Associates Civil Law, PLLC by BGP Properties, LLC.(Cole, Carolyn)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2018 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan due by 9/28/2018. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
August 20, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. BGP Properties, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by September 11, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 9/11/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
August 20, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London shall file a disclosure statement by August 28, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 8/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(mc)
August 20, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-729-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London.(Suslak, Brian)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Suslak on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Attorney Brian Andrew Suslak added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London(pty:dft).(Suslak, Brian)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Grafton County Superior Court, case number 215-2018-CV-00113 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1698959) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Answer Follow Up on 9/10/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graceffa, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BGP Properties, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BGP Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BGP Properties, LLC
Represented By: Carolyn K. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: John P. Graceffa
Represented By: Brian Andrew Suslak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?