Randolph v. WBL SPE II, LLC
Plaintiff: Selena S. Randolph
Defendant: WBL SPE II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00730
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties' proposed discovery plan to be filed on or before October 26, 2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/23/2018 AT 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante is hereby CANCELLED. (jb)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER withdrawing #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.. Text of Order: Withdrawn. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/5/2018. (Pltfs Atty: Peter S. Wright) (Defts Atty: Susan Aileen Lowry)(Total Hearing Time: 5 minutes) (jb)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The court will initiate the call.(jb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Parties' Stipulated & Disputed Facts for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by WBL SPE II, LLC(Lowry, Susan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 Joint Timeline for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by WBL SPE II, LLC(Lowry, Susan)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue Preliminay Injunction Hearing. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Evidentiary Hearing reset for 10/23/2018 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by WBL SPE II, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 10/9/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lowry, Susan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to WBL SPE II, LLC by WBL SPE II, LLC. Served/Mailed on 8/24/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lowry, Susan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Selena S. Randolph. Surreply due by 9/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Personal Guaranty)(Wright, Peter)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/11/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Injunction Hearing #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties to proceed as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intention to Move for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum - LR 7.1(e) by Selena S. Randolph.(Wright, Peter)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by WBL SPE II, LLC. Follow up on Reply on 9/14/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Formation, #3 Exhibit B- Business Loan Summary, #4 Exhibit C- Business Loan Authorization Agreement for Deposit and Payments, #5 Exhibit D- Business Loan Purpose Affidavit, #6 Exhibit E- Business Promissory Note)(Lowry, Susan)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sabrina C. Beavens on behalf of WBL SPE II, LLC Attorney Sabrina C. Beavens added to party WBL SPE II, LLC(pty:dft).(Beavens, Sabrina)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Aileen Lowry on behalf of WBL SPE II, LLC Attorney Susan Aileen Lowry added to party WBL SPE II, LLC(pty:dft).(Lowry, Susan)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Text of Order: Based on representations by defendant's counsel during today's telephone conference, the scheduled foreclosure will not proceed on August 21, 2018. Defendant shall file its objection to plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (doc. no. 2) on or before September 7, 2018, So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ac)
August 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/20/2018. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Peter S. Wright, Jr.) (Defts Atty: Sabrina Beavens, Susan Lowry)(Total Hearing Time: 12 minutes) (jb)
August 20, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 8/20/2018 at 02:15 PM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The court will initiate the call.(jb)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to WBL SPE II, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Selena S. Randolph. Follow up on Objection on 9/4/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Selena Randolph, #2 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Wright, Peter)
August 20, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 20, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-730-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1698984 filed by Selena S. Randolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bank Statement, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Mortgage Servicer Worksheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Foreclosure, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Lawsuit, #7 Waiver of Service). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Wright, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. WBL SPE II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WBL SPE II, LLC
Represented By: Sabrina C. Beavens
Represented By: Susan Aileen Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena S. Randolph
Represented By: Peter S. Wright, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?