Rogers v. New Hampshire, State of

Petitioner: Scott N. Rogers
Respondent: New Hampshire, State of
Undetermined: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00740
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 10 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendation filed by Scott N. Rogers. (lml)
October 2, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER denying #8 Motion for Reconsideration re: #6 Order on Motion for a Hearing. The clerk's office is directed to redocket Document No. 8 as an objection to the Sept. 10, 2018 R&R (Doc. No. 4). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
September 27, 2018 8 MOTION to Reconsider appearing Before this Court in Person! and Forgiveness! For Deceat re: #6 Order on Motion filed by Scott N. Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lml)
September 26, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER re: #7 MOTION to Force New Hampshire, State of to Go by Their Written Law from the Law Books. The Senence was and, is in violation of a Lawful Sentence. Text of Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Force (Doc. No. 7) seeks a hearing on his petition for a writ of habeas corpus (Doc. No. 1) and an order releasing him from state prison. Construed liberally, the motion appears to be an objection to the September 10, 2018 Report and Recommendation ("R&R") (Doc. No. 4). Accordingly, the clerk's office is directed to update the docket to indicate that Document No. 7 is an "objection" to the Sept. 10 R&R (Doc. No. 4), and to submit Document No. 7 to the district judge for consideration in connection with that Sept. 10 R&R, after the R&R objection period closes on October 3, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
September 22, 2018 7 Featured Case Objection to Report and Recommendation (pursuant to Endorsed Order dated 9/26/2018 by Magistrate Judge Johnstone.)MOTION to Force New Hampshire, State of, to Go by Their Written Law from the Law Books. The Sentence was and, is in violation of a Lawful Sentence filed by Scott N. Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jbw) Modified on 9/26/2018 to add: objection text (lml).
September 20, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER denying #5 Motion to be Able to Stand Before the Judge; This court sets October 3, 2018 as the new deadline for Rogers to file his objections to the Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 4). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (lml)
September 14, 2018 5 MOTION to be Able to Stand Before the Judge filed by Scott N. Rogers. HEARING REQUESTED. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lml)
September 10, 2018 4 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, recommending the petition be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 9/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
September 6, 2018 3 MOTION for New Trial, Inefficient Counsel filed by Scott N. Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Attachments pgs 6 -15, #2 Envelope.) (lml)
September 6, 2018 Filing Fee paid - case converted to a civil case: $5.00 (check), receipt number 14649016854 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. New case number is 1:18-cv-740-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
August 22, 2018 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution. NOTICE Signed by Deputy Clerk Lianne Lavigne. Compliance Deadline set for 10/22/2018. (lml)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
August 21, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 filed by Scott N. Rogers.(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. New Hampshire, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New Hampshire, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott N. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?