Optiv Security Inc. v. Rahn et al
Plaintiff: Optiv Security Inc.
Defendant: Riptide Technologies, LLC, Sankaty Solutions, LLC and Patrick Rahn
Case Number: 1:2018cv00741
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Assented to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert J. Hingula, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 9/7/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sankaty Solutions, LLC by Optiv Security Inc.. Served/Mailed on 8/27/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/29/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Riptide Technologies, LLC by Optiv Security Inc.. Served/Mailed on 8/27/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/29/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Patrick Rahn by Optiv Security Inc.. Served/Mailed on 8/27/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/29/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
August 28, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Assented to MOTION for Robert J. Hingula to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1702409.) filed by Optiv Security Inc. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Robert J. Hingula to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1702409.) filed by Optiv Security Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Robert J. Hingula, Esq.)(Harris, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to Patrick Rahn, Riptide Technologies, LLC, Sankaty Solutions, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (lml)
August 23, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
August 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-741-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Optiv Security Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lirette, Ryan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Paul Lirette on behalf of Optiv Security Inc. Attorney Ryan Paul Lirette added to party Optiv Security Inc.(pty:pla).(Lirette, Ryan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1700355 filed by Optiv Security Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver Patrick Rahn, #4 Summons - Waiver Riptide Technologies, LLC, #5 Summons - Waiver Sankaty Solutions, LLC)(Harris, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optiv Security Inc. v. Rahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riptide Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sankaty Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optiv Security Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Paul Lirette
Represented By: James P. Harris
Represented By: Robert J. Hingula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?