Martinez v. USA

Petitioner: Christopher Martinez
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00748
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 10/15/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aframe, Seth)
October 1, 2018 4 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 1, 2018 filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 10/15/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aframe, Seth)
September 20, 2018 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate filed by Christopher Martinez. (mc)
August 30, 2018 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth R. Aframe on behalf of USA Attorney Seth R. Aframe added to party USA(pty:res).(Aframe, Seth)
August 29, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. Text of Order: The government shall respond to the motion within 30 days. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-748-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (mc)
August 22, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255 filed by Christopher Martinez. Notice of Filing to US Attorney with copy of the motion. See also Criminal Case No. 1:15-cr-29-PB. (mc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2018: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit)) (vln).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?