Wilkins et al v. Rymes Heating Oils, Inc. et al

Appellant: Nichole T. Wilkins and Raymond Mulcahey
Us Trustee: US Trustee
Appellee: Rymes Heating Oils, Inc. and Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Trustee: Harold B. Murphy
Case Number: 1:2018cv00750
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 Appellant's BRIEF by Raymond Mulcahey, Nichole T. Wilkins. Follow up on Appellee Brief on 11/19/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Johnson, Leslie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2018: #1 Text Searchable Version of Brief) (cmp).
October 19, 2018 Filing 15 Appendix to Appellants' Brief (Vol 2 of 2) by Raymond Mulcahey, Nichole T. Wilkins(Johnson, Leslie)
October 19, 2018 Filing 14 Appendix to Appellants' Brief (Vol 1 of 2) by Raymond Mulcahey, Nichole T. Wilkins(Johnson, Leslie)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 SURREPLY to Reply to #6 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8020 filed by Raymond Mulcahey, Nichole T. Wilkins. (Johnson, Leslie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #6 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8020 filed by Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC, Rymes Heating Oils, Inc.. Surreply due by 10/16/2018. (Herz, Courtney)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 Re-filed see #7 Reply to Objection to #6 Motion - OBJECTION to #6 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8020 filed by Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC, Rymes Heating Oils, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 10/18/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Herz, Courtney) Modified on 10/11/2018 to add re-filed text (jb).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to the Objection. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/12/2018.(jb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to the Objection filed by Appellants in response to Rymes' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8020 Concerning Frivolous Appeal filed by Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC, Rymes Heating Oils, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appellees' Reply Memorandum)(Herz, Courtney)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. Text of Order: Granted in part. Opening brief due on or before October 19, 2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Appellant Brief on 10/19/2018.(jb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #6 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8020 filed by Raymond Mulcahey, Nichole T. Wilkins. Follow up on Reply on 10/5/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Candon article)(Johnson, Leslie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 MOTION to Extend Time to File Opening Brief Currently due October 5, 2018 filed by Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC, Rymes Heating Oils, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 10/5/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Herz, Courtney)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to File Opening Brief filed by Raymond Mulcahey, Nichole T. Wilkins. Follow up on Objection on 10/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Johnson, Leslie)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8020 filed by Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC, Rymes Heating Oils, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 9/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 22, 2018 email, #2 Exhibit B - Sale Order, #3 Exhibit C- 12/4/17 Letter to Leslie Johnson, Esq.)(Herz, Courtney)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE - Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Complete. Parties shall file briefs in accordance with the deadlines established in B.R. 8018. Follow up on Appellant Brief on 10/5/2018.(jb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS filed for dates of July 6, 2018 re Motion to Dismiss before Judge Michael A. Fagone, Transcription by: Cascade Hills Transcription, Inc.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Duty Recorder at the US Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Hampshire before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jtp)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation part 2, #2 Appellee Designation part 1, #3 Appellee Designation part 2, #4 Appellee Designation part 3) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jtp)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Herz, Courtney)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Rymes Heating Oils, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Herz, Courtney)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Rymes Heating Oils, Inc., Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Rymes Heating Oils, Inc. and Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by September 4, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 9/4/2018. (lml)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
August 24, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-750-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (US Bankruptcy Appellate Panel No. NH 18-029; USBC-NH 14-12188, Adv. No. 18-01031) filed by Rymes Heating Oils, Inc., Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC.(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins et al v. Rymes Heating Oils, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nichole T. Wilkins
Represented By: Leslie H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Raymond Mulcahey
Represented By: Leslie H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: Geraldine L. Karonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rymes Heating Oils, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Candon
Represented By: Courtney H. G. Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rymes Energy Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Candon
Represented By: Courtney H. G. Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Harold B. Murphy
Represented By: Harold B. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?