Strahan v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Administrator et al

Plaintiff: Richard Maximus Strahan
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Administrator and National Marine Fisheries Service, Assistant Administrator
Case Number: 1:2018cv00752
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. This Order addresses Mr. Strahan's conduct. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion; granting #9 Motion; denying #10 Motion for Recusal. As outlined within: Piecing together all the information plaintiff has provided, the court finds that he has satisfied AP 6.1(c) and 6.2(a). Plaintiff's motion for ECF access is therefore granted. Plaintiff's motion to recuse is denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Recusal of Magistrate Judge Johnstone filed by Richard Maximus Strahan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION- Redundant & Pointless Motion for ECF Filing Access filed by Richard Maximus Strahan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(js)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION- Plaintiff's Second Demand 4 Access to the ECF Filing System So That He May File Documents With The Court I the Instant Action filed by Richard Maximus Strahan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Maximus Strahan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: Strahan has not complied with the Aug. 29, 2018 Order (Doc. No. 6) granting him fourteen days to return completed summonses to this court for service. This action will be dismissed without prejudice as to all defendants unless Strahan files completed summonses by November 27, 2018, or files a motion by that date showing good cause why that deadline should be extended. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER as described within denying as moot #4 Motion to order the U.S. Marshals to serve defendants and waive filing fee; denying without prejudice #5 Motion for access to the ECF filing system. Strahan must complete summonses for defendants, using Form AO 440, before any summonses will be issued and this action may be served. Strahan must file completed summons forms for defendants within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Service shall be effected by the court clerk's office in the manner specified in this Order. The motion to order the U.S. Marshals Service to serve defendants and to waive the filing fee (Doc. No. 4) is denied as moot. The motion for ECF access (Doc. No. 5) is denied without prejudice to plaintiff refiling a similar motion using the appropriate form (USDCNH-97(10-14)). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Then a Preliminary Injunction Against. Text of Order: Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, has requested a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. No. 2). To the extent ex parte relief is requested, the request is denied as plaintiff has not made any certification regarding the efforts that have been made to give notice to the adverse party and has failed to show why notice should not be required here. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b )(1); Granny Goose Foods, Inc. v. Bhd. of Teamsters & Auto Truck Drivers Local No. 70, 415 U.S. 423, 43839 (1974). The request for a preliminary injunction in Document No. 2 is otherwise taken under advisement. The magistrate judge is designated to consider that request and, if necessary, conduct a hearing on the matter. The magistrate judge shall file proposed findings and recommendations with the court. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(de)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
August 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-752-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Access to the ECF Filing System filed by Richard Maximus Strahan.(lml)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Waive the Filing Fee and to Order US Marshal to Serve the Summons on the Defendants filed by Richard Maximus Strahan.(lml)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Richard Maximus Strahan.(lml)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Then a Preliminary Injunction Against the Defendants filed by Richard Maximus Strahan.(lml)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Marine Fisheries Service, Assistant Administrator, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Administrator with Jury Demand filed by Richard Maximus Strahan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strahan v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Administrator et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service, Assistant Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Maximus Strahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?