Stow v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Weston J. Stow
Defendant: George Corriveau and Anne Davis
Undetermined: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00768
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
0 Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
1 Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #5 Status Report. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
September 21, 2018 5 STATUS REPORT by Weston J. Stow (ko)
September 13, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #4 Status Update. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
September 10, 2018 4 STATUS UPDATE by Weston J. Stow (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jb)
August 29, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as to Weston Stow, initial fee of $23.33. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding month's income credited to the plaintiff's account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Finance Follow Up Deadline 10/29/2018. (lml)
August 29, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 23, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-768-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 23, 2018 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Weston J. Stow. (mc)
August 23, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against George Corriveau, Anne Davis filed by Weston J. Stow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses, #3 Addendum Part 1, #4 Addendum Part 2, #5 Exhibits A-Z, #6 Exhibits A1-H1, #7 Sentencing Structure, #8 Exhaustion of Remedies, #9 Cover Letter, #10 Table of Contents, #11 Envelope) (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stow v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Corriveau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weston J. Stow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?