Faigel v. IADMD Holdings, LLC

Plaintiff: Julia O. Faigel DMD, P.C. and Julia O. Faigel
Defendant: IADMD Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00797
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re: #17 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count II-V of the Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 11/20/2018. (lml)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Assented to Motion for Laura B. Najemy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Laura B. Najemy submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/29/2018. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Assented to Motion for Robert M. O'Connell, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert M. O'Connell, Jr. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/29/2018. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Assented to Motion for R. David Hosp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that R. David Hosp submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/29/2018. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Nov. 20, 2018 , Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count II-V of the Complaint to Nov. 20, 2018 filed by Julia O. Faigel.(Gaff, Brian)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count II-V of the Complaint filed by IADMD Holdings, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 10/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Supporting Memorandum of Law)(McElwain, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Laura B. Najemy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1721552.) filed by Julia O. Faigel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 - Najemy Affidavit ISO Motion)(Gaff, Brian)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Robert M. O'Connell, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1721547.) filed by Julia O. Faigel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 - O'Connell Affidavit ISO Motion)(Gaff, Brian)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for R. David Hosp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1721546.) filed by Julia O. Faigel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 - Hosp Affidavit ISO Motion)(Gaff, Brian)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 11/7/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #13 Counterclaim, filed by IADMD Holdings, LLC. No description of exhibits or attachments was included. Exhibits or attachments shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-226-7326.(lml)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Christopher McElwain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Christopher Ross McElwain submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/22/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(lml)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER and COUNTERCLAIM against Julia O. Faigel with jury demand Answer and Counterclaims filed by IADMD Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Summons) Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(McDonald, Kyle)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 Addendum/Concurrence Statement to #10 MOTION for Christopher McElwain to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1718609.) by IADMD Holdings, LLC. (McDonald, Kyle) Modified on 10/11/2018 to add description of addendum. (jbw).
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 Addendum/Certificate of Service to #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance by IADMD Holdings, LLC. (McDonald, Kyle) Modified on 10/11/2018 to add description of addendum. (jbw).
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #10 MOTION for Christopher McElwain to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by IADMD Holdings, LLC. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-226-7326.(lml)
October 10, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Documents re: #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #10 MOTION for Christopher McElwain to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by IADMD Holdings, LLC. No certificate of service on either document. Document no. 10 fails to comply with LR 7.1-No statement of concurrence was included. File a certificate of service/concurrence statement as an addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing to document nos. 9 and 10. The documents will remain on file. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-226-7326. Compliance Deadline set for 10/22/2018.(lml)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Christopher McElwain to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1718609.) filed by IADMD Holdings, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 10/23/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Attorney McElwain)(McDonald, Kyle)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle McDonald on behalf of IADMD Holdings, LLC Attorney Kyle McDonald added to party IADMD Holdings, LLC(pty:dft).(McDonald, Kyle)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to IADMD Holdings, LLC by Julia O. Faigel. Served/Mailed on 9/24/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/15/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gaff, Brian)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons issued electronically as to IADMD Holdings, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (lml)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Julia O. Faigel(Gaff, Brian)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Julia O. Faigel disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Gaff, Brian)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (mc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to IADMD Holdings, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-797-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Form AO120 Report on Filing of Action Regarding a Trademark by Julia O. Faigel DMD, P.C..(Gaff, Brian)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1704343 filed by Julia O. Faigel DMD, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Gaff, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faigel v. IADMD Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IADMD Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ross McElwain
Represented By: Kyle McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia O. Faigel DMD, P.C.
Represented By: Brian M. Gaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia O. Faigel
Represented By: Brian M. Gaff
Represented By: Laura B. Najemy
Represented By: Robert M. O'Connell, Jr.
Represented By: R. David Hosp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?