USA v. Manchester, NH, City of

Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: City of Manchester and Manchester, NH, City of
Case Number: 1:2018cv00815
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Decree filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kautsky, Peter)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-815-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lodging, #3 Proposed Order Consent Decree)(Kautsky, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #4 Electronic Signature Complaint) (mc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #5 Electronic Signature Consent Decree, #6 Electronic Signature Civil Cover Sheet) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Manchester, NH, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Peter Kautsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Peter Kautsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Manchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester, NH, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?