Martinez v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Martinez
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation and Getinge AB
Case Number: 1:2018cv00819
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique)
September 26, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting (953) Assented to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines in case 1:16-md-02753-LM and the respective pleading in the underlying civil cases. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
September 26, 2018 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Grasher on behalf of Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Getinge USA, Inc., Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft).(Grasher, David)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for Tuesday, 10/23/2018 at 2:00 PM EST before Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
September 25, 2018 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique)
September 24, 2018 2 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 12, 2018 MDL 2753: Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-819-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 12, 2018 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1708585 filed by Carlos Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getinge AB
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Martinez
Represented By: W. Todd Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?