Ochoa et al v. Gosselin

Plaintiff: Ted David Ochoa and Buffie Larocca
Defendant: Helen Gosselin
Case Number: 1:2018cv00820
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 11/13/2018. (vln)
November 8, 2018 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 11/13/2014 filed by Helen Gosselin.(Duggan, Stephen)
November 8, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Gosselin. Attorney Stephen A. Duggan added to party Helen Gosselin(pty:dft).(Duggan, Stephen)
October 18, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 11/6/2018.(vln)
October 17, 2018 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 6, 2018 filed by Buffie Larocca, Ted David Ochoa.(Hutchins, Peter)
October 17, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, ECF Notice with Judge Assignment and Consent form as to Helen Gosselin filed by Ted David Ochoa, Buffie Larocca. Served/Mailed on 10/1/2018.(Hutchins, Peter)
September 13, 2018 3 Summons issued electronically as to Helen Gosselin. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 12, 2018 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties.(mc)
September 12, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-820-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 12, 2018 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1708823 filed by Ted David Ochoa, Buffie Larocca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Hutchins, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #3 Electronic Signature Civil Cover Sheet, #4 PDF Text Searchable Complaint) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa et al v. Gosselin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted David Ochoa
Represented By: Peter E. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffie Larocca
Represented By: Peter E. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Gosselin
Represented By: Stephen A. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?