Pless v. USA

Petitioner: Jeremiah Pless
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00827
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
October 26, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Appointment of Attorney Michael J. Iacopino for Jeremiah Pless for 2255. Assignment accepted on 10/26/2018. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
October 19, 2018 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by USA.(Aframe, Seth)
October 12, 2018 3 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to October 26, 2018 filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 10/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aframe, Seth)
October 11, 2018 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth R. Aframe on behalf of USA Attorney Seth R. Aframe added to party USA(pty:res).(Aframe, Seth)
September 14, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER RE #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. Text of Order: The government shall respond to the motion within 30 days. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on 10/15/2018.(js)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(lml)
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-827-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
September 11, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255 filed by Jeremiah Pless (unsigned). Notice of Filing to US Attorney with copy of the motion. See also Criminal Case No. 15-cr-110-01-PB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Work Punches C+S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Debit Card Statements, #3 Exhibit C - Selected Examples, #4 Exhibit D - Scholarly Article, #5 Envelope)(lml) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2018: #6 Signed signature page) (lml).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pless v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremiah Pless
Represented By: Michael J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?