MSPA Claims 1, LLC v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Defendant: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00830
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Ashley Kellegren complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/16/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
October 6, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Michael K. Kiernan complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/16/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
October 6, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to November 14, 2018 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 11/14/2018. (jb)
October 5, 2018 9 Assented to MOTION for Ashley Kellegren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1717621.) filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Kellgren)(Murdough, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 8 Assented to MOTION for Michael K. Kiernan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1717613.) filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Kiernan)(Murdough, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 7 Disclosure Statement by Covington Specialty Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Murdough, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 14, 2018 filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company.(Murdough, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah S. Murdough on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company Attorney Sarah S. Murdough added to party Covington Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Murdough, Sarah)
September 28, 2018 4 Return of Service Executed as to Covington Specialty Insurance Company by MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Served/Mailed on 9/24/2018. Answer Follow Up on 10/15/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Alvarez, Tawny)
September 20, 2018 3 Disclosure Statement by MSPA Claims 1, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Alvarez, Tawny)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. MSPA Claims 1, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by September 25, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 9/25/2018. (lml)
September 19, 2018 2 Summons issued electronically as to Covington Specialty Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (lml)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
September 19, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-830-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
September 13, 2018 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1709343 filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Diagnosis Codes Identified in Connection with Accident-Related Treatment, #2 Exhibit B - Florida Healthcare Plus to La Ley Recovery Systems Inc. Assignment, #3 Exhibit B.1 - La Ley Recovery Systems, Inc. to MSPA Claims 1, LLC Assignment, #4 Exhibit B.2 - Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit B.3 - Order Approving Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit C - Demand Letter_Redacted, #7 Exhibit C.1 - Spreadsheet to Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit C.2 - Assignment of Claims and Causes of Action, #9 Exhibit C.3 - Cost Recovery Agreement, #10 Exhibit D - CMS Directory of MAOs, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Alvarez, Tawny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSPA Claims 1, LLC v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Tawny L. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah S. Murdough
Represented By: Ashley Kellegren
Represented By: Michael K. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?