Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Nutter Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Gilmanton Sand & Gravel, Inc. and Nutter Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00834
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Gilmanton Sand & Gravel, Inc., Nutter Enterprises, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Wyatt, Joshua)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua M. Wyatt on behalf of Gilmanton Sand & Gravel, Inc., Nutter Enterprises, Inc. Attorney Joshua M. Wyatt added to party Gilmanton Sand & Gravel, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua M. Wyatt added to party Nutter Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wyatt, Joshua)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement Pending DOJ Review by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. Attorney Caitlin Peale Sloan added to party Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Consent Decree)(Peale Sloan, Caitlin)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Cailtin Peale Sloan submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 10/1/2018. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(mc)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summonses and Waivers issued electronically as to Gilmanton Sand & Gravel, Inc., Nutter Enterprises, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-834-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Caitlin Peale Sloan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1710327.) filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 10/1/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Griefen, Zachary)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Griefen, Zachary)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1710306 filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Notice of Lawsuit)(Griefen, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #5 Nutter Waiver, #6 Gilmanton Waiver, #7 Nutter Notice of Lawsuit, #8 Gilmanton Notice of Lawsuit, #9 Nutter Summons, #10 Gilmanton Waiver) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Nutter Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmanton Sand & Gravel, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutter Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Knox Griefen
Represented By: Caitlin Peale Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?