US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Party City Corporation

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Party City Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00838
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint - New Case.. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Answer Follow Up on 1/18/2019. (vln)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 18, 2019 filed by Party City Corporation.(Rattigan, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that HEATHER R. BOSHAK submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/16/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Assented to MOTION for Heather R. Boshak, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . filed by Party City Corporation. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (vln)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Party City Corporation disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rattigan, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Heather R. Boshak, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1729140.) filed by Party City Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Rattigan, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth K. Rattigan on behalf of Party City Corporation Attorney Elizabeth K. Rattigan added to party Party City Corporation(pty:dft).(Rattigan, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Party City Corporation by US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Served/Mailed on 9/20/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/23/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Penzel, Markus)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Party City Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
September 20, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-838-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Penzel, Markus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Party City Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Party City Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Rattigan
Represented By: Heather R. Boshak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Markus L. Penzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Markus L. Penzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?