McKenney v. Dover School District, SAU #11

Plaintiff: Michael J McKenney and Michael McKenney
Defendant: Dover School District, SAU #11
Case Number: 1:2018cv00850
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/27/2018. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand and Statement of Affirmative Defenses filed by Dover School District, SAU #11.(Closson, Thomas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dover School District, SAU #11 by Michael McKenney. Served/Mailed on 9/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(King, Benjamin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Dover School District, SAU #11. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
September 25, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
September 24, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-850-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1712734 filed by Michael J McKenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Lawsuit - School Board, #5 Notice of Lawsuit - Superintendent, #6 Waiver - School Board, #7 Waiver - Superintendent)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenney v. Dover School District, SAU #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J McKenney
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McKenney
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover School District, SAU #11
Represented By: Thomas M. Closson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?