Beechwood II Homeowners Association et al v. Lincoln, NH, Town of
Appellant: Beechwood II Homeowners Association
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Appellee: Lincoln, NH, Town of
Trustee: Michael S. Askenaizer
Us Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 1:2018cv00912
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Pleading Schedule. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS filed for dates of 09/18/2018 re Hearing on Motion to Approve Settlement Stipulation before Judge Bruce A. Harwood, Transcription by: Cascade Hills Transcription, Inc.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Duty Recorder at the US Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Hampshire before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2019. (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, TMB)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation Part 2, #2 Appellant Designation Part 3) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, TMB)
November 7, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The new case designation is: 18-cv-912-JD. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(de)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty recused. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Pleading Schedule with Certicate of Service filed by Beechwood II Homeowners Association.(Jones, Franklin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Beechwood II Homeowners Association disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. with attached Certificate of Service (Jones, Franklin)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 4, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Beechwood II Homeowners Association. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Beechwood II Homeowners Association shall file a disclosure statement by Franklin C. Jones, Esq. Disclosure Statement due 10/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
October 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-912-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Bankruptcy Court case number 16-10174-BAH) filed by Beechwood II Homeowners Association.(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beechwood II Homeowners Association et al v. Lincoln, NH, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Beechwood II Homeowners Association
Represented By: Franklin C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lincoln, NH, Town of
Represented By: David P. Azarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Michael S. Askenaizer
Represented By: James S. LaMontagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: Geraldine L. Karonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?