Santander Bank, N.A. v. Cunningham et al
Plaintiff: Santander Bank, N.A. FKA Sovereign Bank, N.A. and Santander Bank, N.A.
Defendant: United States of America, Jonathan C Cunningham, Jonathan C. Cunningham and USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00925
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Santander Bank, N.A.. Served/Mailed on 10/25/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/15/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 ROS, #2 ROS, #3 ROS)(Dailey, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Disclaimer of Interest in Interpled Funds by USA. Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party USA(pty:dft).(McCormack, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Santander Bank, N.A. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Santander Bank, N.A. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Dailey, Matthew)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case filed by Santander Bank, N.A. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Santander Bank, N.A. shall file a disclosure statement by October 18, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 10/18/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-925-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1719087 filed by Santander Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dailey, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #2 Corrected Complaint, #3 Summons Cunningham, #4 Summons USA) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santander Bank, N.A. v. Cunningham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santander Bank, N.A. FKA Sovereign Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew M. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santander Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew M. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan C Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan C. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?