Castro v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Maria Castro
Defendant: Getinge AB, Atrium Medical Corporation and Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00932
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2018 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to the Deadline to File a Reply in Support of Getinge ABs Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Getinge AB. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Aytch, Enjolique)
November 8, 2018 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by All Defendants. Served/Mailed on 10/11/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/13/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aytch, Enjolique)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (vln)
October 11, 2018 MDL 2753: Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 18-cv-932-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (vln)
October 11, 2018 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1719843 filed by Maria Castro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Papantonakis, Caryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getinge AB
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Castro
Represented By: Caryn M. Papantonakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?