McNeil v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark MG McNeil
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00955
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (de)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #9 Stipulation of Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to case without prejudice by Mark MG McNeil(Harman, Terrie)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 11/26/2018. (de)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to 11/26/18 filed by Mark MG McNeil.(Harman, Terrie)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/3/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 11/15/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Foreclosure Deed, #3 Exhibit Bankruptcy Proceeding Documents, #4 Exhibit Unofficial property report card)(Polansky, Kevin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand Defendant's Answer to Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.(Polansky, Kevin)
October 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER mooting #4 Motion to Extend Time to File Its Responsive Pleading; granting #5 Motion. Text of Order: Amended Motion to Extend Time to Answer (Doc. no. 5, Attachment 1) is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). Doc. No. 4 is moot. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Assented to MOTION to Amend #4 MOTION to Extend Time to File Its Responsive Pleading filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Motion)(Polansky, Kevin)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to File Its Responsive Pleading filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 11/8/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Polansky, Kevin)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2018-CV-326, Strafford County Superior Court(Polansky, Kevin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Polansky, Kevin)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by October 29, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 10/29/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
October 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-955-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford Superior Court, case number 219-2018-CV-00326 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1722834) filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Answer Follow Up on 11/9/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polansky, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark MG McNeil
Represented By: Terrie L. Harman
Represented By: Kristina Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?