USA v. Perry

Petitioner: USA
Respondent: Verna Perry
Case Number: 1:2018cv00995
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 BENCH WARRANT Issued. Copies to USM this date.(cmp)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 12/20/2018. Defendant Verna Perry did not show. Government requested that the court issue a Bench Warrant. The Court approved request. Bench Warrant to issue as to Verna Perry. So. Ordered by District Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock) (Pltfs Atty: Terry Ollila, AUSA)(Total Hearing Time: 10 minutes) (cmp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Petition for Civil Contempt and Order to Show Cause as to Verna Perry filed by USA. Served/Mailed on 11/8/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/29/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Return of Service by Deputy Sheriff Donald L. Clay)(Ollila, Terry)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/20/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (mc)
October 30, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-995-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Declaration of Allison Vermette, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ollila, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Verna Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?