Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. NH Fish and Game Department
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Fish and Game Department, Ernest Millette, David Patch, Christina Luppi, McInnis, Christopher Hodgdon, NH Fish and Game Commission, NH Fish and Game Department, Robert Phillipson, Barry Carr, Todd Baldwin, Glenn Normandeau, Eric G. Stohl, Bruce Temple and Ray Green
Case Number: 1:2018cv00996
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 12/13/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 Affidavit of Christopher Aslin)(Irwin, Thomas)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Replaces doc. no. 2. (Irwin, Thomas)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc fails to comply with LR 2.7(a). All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the Filing Users name, bar registration number, address, primary telephone number, and e-mail address. The signature must comply with LR 2.7(b)(1). Filer shall refile the disclosure statement and enter in the docket text Replaces doc. no. 2.Compliance Deadline set for 11/14/2018.(vln)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Irwin, Thomas)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 31, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by November 7, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 11/7/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
October 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-996-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1727754 filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 NH Fish & Game Permit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #4 Summons - Waiver BC Waiver, #5 Summons - Waiver BC Summons, #6 Summons - Waiver BT Waiver, #7 Summons - Waiver BT Summons, #8 Summons - Waiver CH Waiver, #9 Summons - Waiver CH Summons, #10 Summons - Waiver CL Waiver, #11 Summons - Waiver CL Summons, #12 Summons - Waiver DP Waiver, #13 Summons - Waiver DP Summons, #14 Summons - Waiver ES Waiver, #15 Summons - Waiver ES Summons, #16 Summons - Waiver GN Waiver, #17 Summons - Waiver GN Summons, #18 Summons - Waiver NHFGC Waiver, #19 Summons - Waiver NHFGC Summons, #20 Summons - Waiver NHFGD Waiver, #21 Summons - Waiver NHFGD Summons, #22 Summons - Waiver PM Waiver, #23 Summons - Waiver PM Summons, #24 Summons - Waiver RG Waiver, #25 Summons - Waiver RG Summons, #26 Summons - Waiver RP Waiver, #27 Summons - Waiver RP Summons, #28 Summons - Waiver TB Waiver, #29 Summons - Waiver TB Summons)(Irwin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. NH Fish and Game Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish and Game Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Millette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Patch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Luppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hodgdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Fish and Game Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Fish and Game Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Phillipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Normandeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric G. Stohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?