USA v. Kriss
Plaintiff: United States of America and USA
Defendant: Terrence P. Kriss
Case Number: 1:2018cv01011
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Deadlines terminated - Discovery Plan Deadline of 01/14/2019 AND Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/23/2019 is cancelled in light of the stay in this case. (js)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Assented to Motion to Stay Proceedings. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by USA.(Nunez, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/14/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Terrence P. Kriss by USA. Served/Mailed on 11/8/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/10/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nunez, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey N. Nunez on behalf of USA (Nunez, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Terrence P. Kriss. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 1, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1011-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Nunez, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Kriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence P. Kriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?